ND 1293 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 62.1-02-10, 62.1-03-01, and 62.1-04-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to handguns and carrying firearms or dangerous weapons concealed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handguns and carrying firearms or dangerous weapons concealed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2021-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2
2021-04-16HouseConcurred
2021-04-08HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 6
2021-04-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-04-05SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 6
2021-02-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback