ND 1290 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 39-10-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a vehicle overtaking and passing a bicycle on a roadway; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A vehicle overtaking and passing a bicycle on a roadway; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseSigned by Governor 03/16
2021-03-11HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-10SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseReturned to House
2021-03-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 9
2021-03-05SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-01-29SenateReceived from House
2021-01-28HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 59 nays 33
2021-01-22HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1
2021-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 03:15
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback