ND 1290 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of search and seizure procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of search and seizure procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
2019-04-01SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-29SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2019-03-26SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 29
2019-02-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 03:15
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback