ND HB1290 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 43-19.1-28 and 48-01.2-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bids and plans and specifications for public improvements; and to provide for application.
Title
Bids and plans and specifications for public improvements; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] | Rep. Bert Anderson [R] | Rep. Gary Paur [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Rep. Jay Seibel [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 29 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 61 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |