ND 1288 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-12-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an annual permit for oversized vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An annual permit for oversized vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Governor 04/04
2017-04-03HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-03SenateSigned by President
2017-03-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2017-03-31HouseConcurred
2017-03-23HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 02:45
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-02-03HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback