ND 1287 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 39-06-14.2 and a new paragraph to subdivision? a of subsection? 3 of section 39-06.1-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to graduated driver licensing; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-06-01.1, subsection 1 of section 39-06-03, section 39-06-04, subsection 1 of section 39-06-05, sections 39-06-14 and 39-06-17, subsection 4 of section 39-06-42, subsection 2 of section 39-06-43, subdivision i of subsection 2 of section 39-06-49, and subsection 1 of section 39-06.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to drivers licenses issued to operators, restricted licenses, and class D instruction permit; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drivers licenses issued to operators, restricted licenses, and class D instruction permit; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 64
2017-02-09HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 3 2
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback