ND HB1287 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-21-02.4 and 15.1-21-02.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for North Dakota career and technical scholarships and North Dakota academic scholarships.
Title
Eligibility for North Dakota career and technical scholarships and North Dakota academic scholarships.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Dosch [R] | Rep. Joe Heilman [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2013-02-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 3 |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |