ND HB1286 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 21-03-06.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to voter approval of school district building projects funded through a building authority or other indirect means.
Title
Voter approval of school district building projects funded through a building authority or other indirect means.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor 05/06 |
2013-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2013-05-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 55 nays 35 |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2013-05-01 | House | Appoint Rep. Boehning to replace Rep. Amerman on conference committee |
2013-04-29 | House | New conference committee appointed Kasper B. Koppelman Amerman |
2013-04-29 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Laffen Sorvaag Murphy |
2013-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Kasper B. Koppelman Amerman |
2013-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 11 |
2013-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2013-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |