ND 1285 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 50-25.1-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to abandoned infants at certain locations; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned infants at certain locations; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseSigned by Governor 04/24
2019-04-19HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by President
2019-04-17SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-17SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-17SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2019-04-16HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-12HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-04SenateConference committee appointed Clemens K. Roers Hogan
2019-04-02HouseConference committee appointed Rohr Skroch Schneider
2019-04-02HouseRefused to concur
2019-03-25HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0
2019-03-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-07SenateReceived from House
2019-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2019-02-01HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba1285.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0327-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0327-04002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0327-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0327-05002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0327-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0327-05003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0327-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0327-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-23.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-51.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-68.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-69.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback