ND 1283 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-21-02.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for North Dakota scholarships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eligibility for North Dakota scholarships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-12HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8
2017-04-06HouseConcurred
2017-03-30HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-03-13HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-10SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-09SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-08SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3
2017-01-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback