ND HB1282 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for reports to the legislative management; and to provide for a legislative management study regarding agricultural commodity groups.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for reports to the legislative management; and to provide for a legislative management study regarding agricultural commodity groups.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |