ND HB1282 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to using a suppressor for hunting.
Title
Using a suppressor for hunting.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Heilman [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Mark Dosch [R] |
Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 29 nays 17 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2013-01-29 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |