ND 1280 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 16.1-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nullification of official actions; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 16.1-01-01, section 16.1-01-07, subsection 5 of section 16.1-05-04, section 16.1-06-03, subsection 1 of section 16.1-06-04, sections 16.1-06-10.1, 16.1-06-12, 16.1-06-15, 16.1-06-17, 16.1-06-20, 16.1-06-25, 16.1-06-26, 16.1-07-07, 16.1-11-27, 16.1-11-35, 16.1-13-25, and 16.1-13-29, subsection 1 of section 16.1-15-01, sections 16.1-15-02 and 16.1-15-04, subsection 1 of section 16.1-15-08, and sections 16.1-15-09, 16.1-15-10, 16.1-15-13, 16.1-16-04, 16.1-16-07, and 40-21-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electronic counting machines, ballots, election procedures, and election contests; to repeal sections 16.1-06-11, 16.1-06-14, 16.1-07-13, 16.1-13-24, and 16.1-13-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electronic voting systems; to provide a penalty; and to provide for retroactive application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic voting systems; to provide a penalty; and to provide for retroactive application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 81
2021-02-08HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback