ND 1279 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 55
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-06.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amount of statutory fees; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The amount of statutory fees; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 55
2021-04-22HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-22HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2021-04-19HouseNew conference committee appointed Weisz Kading Owens
2021-04-19HouseConference committee report rejected
2021-04-16HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-04-15HouseReported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-07SenateConference committee appointed D. Larsen Fors Dwyer
2021-04-01HouseConference committee appointed Weisz Kading Owens
2021-04-01HouseRefused to concur
2021-03-29HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-26SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1
2021-03-24SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-23SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-02-09SenateReceived from House
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5
2021-02-02HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-01HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback