ND 1279 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a firearm; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of a firearm; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Governor 04/11
2017-04-07HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-04HouseConcurred
2017-03-27HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-24SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-24SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-23SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 4
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 03:15
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback