ND 1278 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Committee Hearing 09:00
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 53-06.1-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligible uses of net proceeds by licensed gaming organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eligible uses of net proceeds by licensed gaming organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05SenateReceived from House
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9
2019-01-29HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
2019-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback