ND 1276 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a limitation on property tax increases by taxing districts without voter approval; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A limitation on property tax increases by taxing districts without voter approval; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 2 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 88
2017-02-08HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback