ND HB1276 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a limitation on property tax increases by taxing districts without voter approval; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A limitation on property tax increases by taxing districts without voter approval; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 2 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 88 |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |