ND 1275 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09.4, a new section to chapter 15-10, a new section to chapter 15-20.1, a new section to chapter 15.1-02, a new section to chapter 21-10, a new section to chapter 54-27, and a new section to chapter 54-34.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an infrastructure bonding repayment fund, a research and innovation fund, a workforce development and lifelong education fund, a student meal and support services fund, a legacy earnings fund, a human services and public health stabilization fund, and a regional economic development infrastructure fund; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 21-10-06, section 21-10-12, and sections 54-54-08.1 and 54-54-08.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to funds invested by the state investment board, legacy fund definitions, and an arts and culture endowment fund; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide a transfer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funds invested by the state investment board, legacy fund definitions, and an arts and culture endowment fund; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide a transfer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
2021-02-23HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 18 3 0
2021-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 02:45
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback