ND 1275 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-19-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the recitation of prayer at activities for public and nonpublic schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The recitation of prayer at activities for public and nonpublic schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseSigned by Governor 04/24
2017-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-24SenateSigned by President
2017-04-21SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-04-21SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-20SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3
2017-04-20HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-20HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-18SenateAppoint Sen. Oban to replace Sen. Schaible on conference committee
2017-04-18SenateAppoint Sen. Schaible to replace Sen. Davison on conference committee
2017-04-12SenateConference committee appointed Davison Schaible Kannianen
2017-04-10HouseConference committee appointed Karls K. Koppelman Simons
2017-04-10HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-31SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 1
2017-03-31SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-22SenateCommittee Hearing 03:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 10
2017-02-09HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 2 0
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 10:50
2017-01-12HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2017-01-12HouseRequest return from committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1275.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0761-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0761-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0761-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0761-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0761-03002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0761-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0761-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-30.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-59.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-72.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-73.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback