ND 1274 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection? 2 of section 52-04-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to relief from charging of benefits paid to accounts of base-period employers that discharge individuals from employment due to undisclosed court-imposed work restrictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief from charging of benefits paid to accounts of base-period employers that discharge individuals from employment due to undisclosed court-imposed work restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 11 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 78
2017-02-09HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-02-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-02HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 1
2017-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback