ND 1273 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon at a public gathering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon at a public gathering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseSigned by Governor 03/29
2017-03-27HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-24SenateSigned by President
2017-03-23HouseReturned to House
2017-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7
2017-03-21SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 19
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 3 2
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback