ND 1272 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 62.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to manufactured firearms, accessories, and ammunition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manufactured firearms, accessories, and ammunition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
2021-03-31SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-18SenateReceived from House
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 23
2021-02-10HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
2021-02-02HouseRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2021-01-27HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback