ND 1272 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 47-16-07.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reasonable accommodations for service animals in rental dwelling units; to amend and reenact section 47-16-07.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disability documentation for service or assistance animals in a rental dwelling; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability documentation for service or assistance animals in a rental dwelling; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-12HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2
2017-04-06HouseConcurred
2017-03-30HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-21SenateReceived from House
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
2017-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 1
2017-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback