ND 1271 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 65-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to employer immunity; to amend and reenact subsection 11 of section 65-01-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of a compensable injury; to provide for retroactive application; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of a compensable injury; to provide for retroactive application; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 79
2021-01-28HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-12HouseRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2021-01-12HouseRequest return from committee
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback