ND 1269 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact sections 15-04-25, 15-04-25.1, and 15-04-25.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state land advisory board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The state land advisory board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 3 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 88
2021-02-02HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 0 3
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback