ND 1269 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 23-27-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to ambulance service partnerships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ambulance service partnerships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 8 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-21HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 80
2019-01-17HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 1 2
2019-01-15HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback