ND 1269 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 12.1-32-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sentencing for aggravated assault; to amend and reenact subdivision k of subsection? 3 of section 12.1-23-05, subsection 5 of section 12.1-32-01, subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 12.1-32-02.1, sections 19-03.1-22.3 and 19-03.1-23, subsection 2 of section 19-03.1-23.1, section 19-03.1-23.4, paragraph 3 of subdivision e of subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-36, subdivision e of subsection 5 of section 19-03.1-36, subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-45, and subsection 29 of section 40-05-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to grading of theft offenses, illegal possession of prescription capsules, pills, or tablets, possession of marijuana, ingesting a controlled substance, and misdemeanor marijuana convictions being excluded as prior offenses for purposes of determining mandatory terms of imprisonment; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grading of theft offenses, illegal possession of prescription capsules, pills, or tablets, possession of marijuana, ingesting a controlled substance, and misdemeanor marijuana convictions being excluded as prior offenses for purposes of determining mandatory terms of imprisonment; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2017-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-20SenateSigned by President
2017-04-18SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 0
2017-04-18SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 3
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-17HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-12SenateAppoint Sen. Osland to replace Sen. D. Larson on conference committee
2017-04-06SenateConference committee appointed Armstrong D. Larson Nelson
2017-04-05HouseConference committee appointed K. Koppelman Satrom M. Nelson
2017-04-05HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-30SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-30SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-29SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 14
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
2017-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:05
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1269.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0633-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0633-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0633-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0633-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0633-03003a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0633-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0633-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-34.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-58.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-70.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback