ND HB1267 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 36-21.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the humane treatment of former research animals.
Title
The humane treatment of former research animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 9 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 84 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |