ND HB1267 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 002 nays 089
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 002 nays 089
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Dever, Dotzenrod, G. Lee A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state veterans' home for a geothermal heating system; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Dever, Dotzenrod, G. Lee A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state veterans' home for a geothermal heating system; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 002 nays 089 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 023 n 000 | |
2009-02-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1267.html |