ND 1265 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-10-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the number of nonresident students admitted to institutions under the control of the state board of higher education under a reciprocity agreement; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The number of nonresident students admitted to institutions under the control of the state board of higher education under a reciprocity agreement; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 26 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 65
2017-02-02HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback