ND 1263 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 53-06.1-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligible uses for charitable gaming net proceeds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eligible uses for charitable gaming net proceeds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-15HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-08SenateSigned by President
2021-04-06HouseReturned to House
2021-04-06SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
2021-04-05SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-15SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-03-08SenateRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2021-03-08SenateRequest return from committee
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-01-26SenateReceived from House
2021-01-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2021-01-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback