ND 1262 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the expansion of existing school safety and crisis reporting programs; and to provide for a continuing appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The expansion of existing school safety and crisis reporting programs; and to provide for a continuing appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 42
2019-03-06SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2019-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 11
2019-02-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2019-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback