ND HB1262 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-02-08.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a renter credit for a disabled veteran who would qualify for the property tax credit for disabled veterans except for the fact that the disabled veteran rents living quarters; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A renter credit for a disabled veteran who would qualify for the property tax credit for disabled veterans except for the fact that the disabled veteran rents living quarters; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 56 |
2015-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |