ND HB1260 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 55
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 55
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 16.1-11-36 and 16.1-12-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to primary election nominations to office.
Title
Primary election nominations to office.
Sponsors
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] |
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 55 |
2015-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |