ND 1259 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 25-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the misrepresentation of a pet as a service animal; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The misrepresentation of a pet as a service animal; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseSigned by Governor 04/17
2019-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-16SenateSigned by President
2019-04-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 4
2019-04-15HouseConcurred
2019-04-05HouseLaid over one legislative day
2019-03-25HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 0
2019-03-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-02-18SenateReceived from House
2019-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 5
2019-02-12HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0
2019-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2019-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:20
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback