ND 1258 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-23-02, 43-23-03, 43-23-04, 43-23-05, 43-23-08, 43-23-08.2, 43-23-09, 43-23-10, 43-23-11.1, 43-23-12, 43-23-13.1, 43-23-14.1, 43-23-16, 43-23-19, 43-23.1-14, 43-23.2-02, and 43-23.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to real estate commission administration and real estate licensing; to repeal chapter 43-23.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to real estate broker trust accounts; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate broker trust accounts; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15HouseSigned by Governor 03/15
2021-03-10HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-08HouseReturned to House
2021-03-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-04SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-03SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-27SenateReceived from House
2021-01-26HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2021-01-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback