ND HB1257 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 38-08-09.4 and sections 38-08-09.5 and 38-08-09.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval requirements for unitization plans.
Title
Approval requirements for unitization plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] |
Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by Governor 03/24 |
2017-03-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |