ND 1257 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 34-06.1-03, 34-06.1-05, 34-06.1-06, and 34-06.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unequal pay for men and women; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unequal pay for men and women; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-20HouseSigned by Governor 03/19
2015-03-17HouseSent to Governor
2015-03-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-16SenateSigned by President
2015-03-12HouseReturned to House
2015-03-11SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2015-03-10SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2015-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2015-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2015-02-23SenateReceived from House
2015-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0
2015-02-05HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
2015-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback