ND 1257 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 23-15-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fireworks permitted to be sold.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fireworks permitted to be sold.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-26SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 29
2013-03-25SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0
2013-03-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-02-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2013-02-25SenateReceived from House
2013-02-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 53 nays 37
2013-02-08HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2013-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2013-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback