ND 1255 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-10-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to duties of the state auditor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Duties of the state auditor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 3 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 91
2021-02-22HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 1 3
2021-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback