ND HB1255 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 24 and a new subsection to section 39-12-05.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a large truck primary highway network and the permitting of increased vehicle weights.
Title
The creation of a large truck primary highway network and the permitting of increased vehicle weights.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2017-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1 |
2017-02-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 4 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |