ND 1254 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Signed by Governor 03/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-29-05, 15.1-29-06, and 15.1-29-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a school district tuition waiver contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A school district tuition waiver contract.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseSigned by Governor 03/30
2017-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-28SenateSigned by President
2017-03-27HouseReturned to House
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-23SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-02-01HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback