ND HB1254 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 39-12-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permits for vehicles of excessive size or weight.
Title
Permits for vehicles of excessive size or weight.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor 04/25 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-05 | Concurred | |
2011-03-11 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0 | |
2011-03-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Received from House | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |