ND 1253 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24, a new section to chapter 16.1-01, sections 16.1-07-13.1 and 16.1-12-10, and a new section to chapter 54-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to election administration; to amend and reenact section 15.1-09-15, subsection 1 of section 16.1-01-01, section 16.1-01-03, subsection 5 of section 16.1-01-04.1, sections 16.1-01-05.1, 16.1-01-06, 16.1-01-07, and 16.1-01-08, subsection 5 of section 16.1-01-09, subsection 7 of section 16.1-01-09.1, sections 16.1-01-12, 16.1-01-16, and 16.1-01-17, the new section to chapter 16.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, as created by section 1 of House Bill No. 1256, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, sections 16.1-02-01, 16.1-02-02, 16.1-02-05, 16.1-02-06, 16.1-02-07, 16.1-02-10, 16.1-02-11, and 16.1-02-13, subsection 2 of section 16.1-05-01, sections 16.1-06-02, 16.1-06-04, 16.1-06-11, 16.1-06-12, 16.1-06-14, 16.1-06-17, 16.1-06-18, 16.1-06-19, 16.1-06-25, and 16.1-06-26, subsection 1 of section 16.1-07-05, sections 16.1-07-06, 16.1-07-07, 16.1-07-08, 16.1-07-09, and 16.1-07-10, subsection 1 of section 16.1-07-12.1, sections 16.1-07-15, 16.1-08.1-01, 16.1-08.1-03.1, 16.1-10-07, 16.1-11-05.1, 16.1-11-06, 16.1-11-10, 16.1-11-11, 16.1-11-12, 16.1-11-16, 16.1-11-18, 16.1-11-19, 16.1-11-20, 16.1-11-21, 16.1-11-22, 16.1-11-31, 16.1-11-32, 16.1-11-33, 16.1-11-35, 16.1-11-36, 16.1-11-37, 16.1-11-39, 16.1-11.1-02, 16.1-11.1-03, 16.1-11.1-08, 16.1-12-01, 16.1-12-02.1, 16.1-12-03, 16.1-12-06, 16.1-12-07, 16.1-12-09, 16.1-13-05, 16.1-13-09, 16.1-13-14, 16.1-13-17, 16.1-13-18, 16.1-13-19, 16.1-13-23, 16.1-13-25, 16.1-13-27, 16.1-13-28, 16.1-13-29, 16.1-13-30, and 16.1-13-31, subsection 1 of section 16.1-15-01, and sections 16.1-15-01.1, 16.1-15-02, 16.1-15-08, 16.1-15-09, 16.1-15-10, 16.1-15-13, 16.1-15-15, 16.1-15-17, 16.1-15-19, 16.1-15-20, 16.1-15-21, 16.1-15-25, 16.1-15-30, 16.1-15-37, 16.1-15-42, 16.1-15-43, 16.1-15-45, 16.1-15-47, 16.1-16-01, 16.1-16-02, 16.1-16-04, 16.1-16-05, and 16.1-16-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to election administration; to repeal sections 16.1-06-10.1, 16.1-07-11, 16.1-07-13, and 16.1-13-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to election administration and the removal of obsolete language; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election administration and the removal of obsolete language; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/30
2021-04-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-29SenateSigned by President
2021-04-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3
2021-04-29SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-29SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-28HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0
2021-04-28HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-28HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-27HouseNew conference committee appointed Kasper Louser Schneider
2021-04-27HouseConference committee report rejected
2021-04-27HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-26HouseNew conference committee appointed Kasper Louser Schneider
2021-04-26SenateConference committee report rejected
2021-04-23SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2021-04-23HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-23HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-16SenateConference committee appointed Vedaa Meyer Marcellais
2021-04-16HouseConference committee appointed Kasper Louser Schneider
2021-04-16HouseRefused to concur
2021-04-14HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-14SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4
2021-04-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-04-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-04-02SenateCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 1
2021-02-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1253.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-05008a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-06008a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-06011a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-08000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-06012a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-09000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0471-10000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-35.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-65.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-72.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-75.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-76.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback