ND 1253 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to voluntary property transfers between school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary property transfers between school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseSigned by Governor 03/24
2017-03-22HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-21SenateSigned by President
2017-03-20HouseReturned to House
2017-03-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-16SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 13
2017-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback