ND 1252 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-10.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to stopping and yielding while operating a bicycle; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stopping and yielding while operating a bicycle; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19HouseSigned by Governor 03/17
2021-03-12HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-11SenateSigned by President
2021-03-10HouseReturned to House
2021-03-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 11
2021-03-08SenateLaid over one legislative day
2021-03-05SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-02-01SenateReceived from House
2021-01-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 68 nays 21
2021-01-25HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1
2021-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 02:45
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback