ND 1251 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the creation of an inmate housing construction program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the creation of an inmate housing construction program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Governor 04/10
2017-04-07HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-04-04HouseConcurred
2017-03-15HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-14SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2017-03-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 16
2017-02-02HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-01HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback