ND HB1250 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 43-23-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensure of organization of a real estate salesperson, broker, or broker associate.
Title
Licensure of organization of a real estate salesperson, broker, or broker associate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2019-03-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |