ND 1249 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-34-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of transportation network companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of transportation network companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04HouseSigned by Governor 04/03
2017-03-31HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-31HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-30SenateSigned by President
2017-03-29HouseReturned to House
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-03-24SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-02HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-01-31HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-30HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback